Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company and AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00455
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Holder, Matthew)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Order to Submit Status Update. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 23, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE Joint Response by Parties and Advisory of Settlement Discussions to #20 Order by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A 2017 AT&T SW CBA, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Agreement of Contribution and Subscription)(Holder, Matthew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE (Joint) Response to Order to File Documents and Advisory to the Court re Settlement Discussions to #20 Order by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 SWBT CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement of Contribution and Subscription)(Rybacki, Timothy)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to File Documents. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (dm)
August 26, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Rybacki, Timothy)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rybacki, Timothy)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Holder, Matthew)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holder, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rybacki, Timothy)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint ; AT&T Services, Inc. answer due 7/15/2022; Southwestern Bell Telephone Company answer due 7/15/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rybacki, Timothy)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; AT&T Services, Inc. answer due 7/1/2022; Southwestern Bell Telephone Company answer due 7/1/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rybacki, Timothy)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company identifying Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Rybacki, Timothy)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy A. Rybacki on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Attorney Timothy A. Rybacki added to party AT&T Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy A. Rybacki added to party Southwestern Bell Telephone Company(pty:dft) (Rybacki, Timothy)
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Holder, Matthew)
May 13, 2022 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Holder, Matthew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (dl)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 issuance of summons requested)(Van Os, David)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16024853), filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Os, David)
May 12, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (dl)
May 12, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Van Os
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Rybacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Rybacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?