Clarke et al v. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Plaintiff: Kevin Clarke, Trevor Boeckmann, Harry Crane, Corwin Smidt, Aristotle International, Inc., Predict It, Inc., Michael Beeler, Mark Borghi, Richard Hanania, James D Miller, Josiah Neeley, Grant Schneider and Wes Shepherd
Defendant: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Case Number: 1:2022cv00909
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Druding, Kyle)
October 20, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aristotle International, Inc., Michael Beeler, Trevor Boeckmann, Mark Borghi, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Richard Hanania, James D Miller, Josiah Neeley, Predict It, Inc., Grant Schneider, Wes Shepherd, Corwin Smidt, re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Predict It, Inc., Plaintiff Corwin Smidt, Plaintiff Kevin Clarke, Plaintiff Aristotle International, Inc., Plaintiff Harry Crane, Plaintiff Trevor Boeckmann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (NADEX Order), #2 Exhibit B (Victoria University of Wellington Ltr), #3 Appendix Request for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Edney, Michael)
October 13, 2022 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission, re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Predict It, Inc., Plaintiff Corwin Smidt, Plaintiff Kevin Clarke, Plaintiff Aristotle International, Inc., Plaintiff Harry Crane, Plaintiff Trevor Boeckmann (Druding, Kyle)
October 11, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission, re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Druding, Kyle)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Commodity Futures Trading Commission amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Trevor Boeckmann, Aristotle International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Edney, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #8 MOTION to Transfer Case and #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (cc3)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aristotle International, Inc., Trevor Boeckmann, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt, re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Edney, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Aristotle International, Inc., Trevor Boeckmann, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix to the Memorandum in Support of a Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order)(Edney, Michael)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANNE W. STUKES. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KYLE MITCHELL DRUDING. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Edney on behalf of Aristotle International, Inc., Trevor Boeckmann, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt. Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Aristotle International, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Trevor Boeckmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Kevin Clarke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Harry Crane(pty:pla), Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Predict It, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Michael James Edney added to party Corwin Smidt(pty:pla) (Edney, Michael)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Druding, Kyle)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Whitford Stukes as an attorney employed by the U.S. government by on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stukes, Anne)
September 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kyle Druding by on behalf of Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Druding, Kyle)
September 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn)
September 9, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn)
September 9, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
September 9, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Predict It, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aristotle International, Inc. for Predict It, Inc.. (Byron, John)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aristotle International, Inc.. (Byron, John)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aristotle International, Inc., Trevor Boeckmann, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt. (Byron, John)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16506830), filed by Predict It, Inc., Corwin Smidt, Kevin Clarke, Harry Crane, Trevor Boeckmann, Aristotle International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - No-Action Relief, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Revocation, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Request for No-Action Relief, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Byron, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke et al v. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Clarke
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Boeckmann
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Crane
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corwin Smidt
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aristotle International, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Predict It, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beeler
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borghi
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hanania
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Miller
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah Neeley
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Schneider
Represented By: John J. Byron
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wes Shepherd
Represented By: Michael James Edney
Represented By: John J. Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Anne Whitford Stukes
Represented By: Kyle Mitchell Druding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?