McBryde et al v. Freedom Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Anthony McBryde, Aileen McBryde and Aileen Name McBryde
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage, Stanley C Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, KBHS Home Loans, LLC, LoanCare, LLC, Stearns Lending, LLC, Codilis & Moody, P.C., Angela Zavala and Nestor Trustee Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01038
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Dustin M Howell
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
December 12, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: referred #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stan Moskowitz #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stanley C Middleman, #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Freedom Mortgage, and #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor Trustee Services, LLC. Referral Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
November 29, 2022 Filing 22 REPLY in Support, filed by Freedom Mortgage, Stanley C Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage, #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz, #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (George, Dustin)
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC (McBryde, Aileen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage (McBryde, Aileen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (McBryde, Aileen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz (McBryde, Aileen)
November 18, 2022 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stanley C Middleman. (George, Dustin)
November 18, 2022 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stan Moskowitz. (George, Dustin)
November 11, 2022 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor Trustee Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(George, Dustin)
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Freedom Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Bankruptcy Filing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss)(George, Dustin)
November 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION filed by Aileen Name McBryde and Anthony McBryde re #11 Notice (Other)by Freedom Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(pg)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Freedom Mortgage (George, Dustin)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(pg)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Telephone Conference for 10/28/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 10/27/2022. Written Order to Follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(pg)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 10/26/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(pg)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's pro se motion to file electronically is GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION Injunctive Relief by Aileen McBryde, Anthony McBryde. (pg)
October 17, 2022 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (cc3)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Anthony McBryde. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 454)filed by Anthony McBryde and Aileen McBryde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cc3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2022: #2 Filing fee receipt) (cc3).
October 14, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony McBryde and Aileen McBryde (cc3)
October 14, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (cc3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBryde et al v. Freedom Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Name McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage
Represented By: Dustin C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley C Middleman
Represented By: Dustin C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Moskowitz
Represented By: Dustin C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBHS Home Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stearns Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codilis & Moody, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestor Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Dustin C. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?