Wallace v. JP Morgan Private Bank et al
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Wallace
Defendant: JP Morgan Private Bank, James M. Inhofe, Jack Kirkpatrick, Kevin Stiff, Jamie Dimon, John or Jane DOE, Kevin Stitt, Trust Company of Oklahoma, Thomas Wilkens, Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, James Weger, Ronald J. Saffa and Morrel Law PLLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01079
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C. Milton on behalf of Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Trust Company of Oklahoma, Thomas Wilkens (Milton, James)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JAMES C. MILTON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
December 6, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Kirk McGill for James C. Milton, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16828137) by on behalf of Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Trust Company of Oklahoma, Thomas Wilkens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Milton Proposed Order re Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(McGill, J.)
December 6, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Ronald J. Saffa, Trust Company of Oklahoma, James Weger, Thomas Wilkens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McGill, J.)
December 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF IMPERMISSIBLE SHOTGUN PLEADING & REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUA SPONTE by Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Ronald J. Saffa, Trust Company of Oklahoma, James Weger, Thomas Wilkens (McGill, J.)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Kirk McGill on behalf of Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Ronald J. Saffa, Trust Company of Oklahoma, Thomas Wilkens. Attorney J. Kirk McGill added to party Robert Lorton, Sr.(pty:dft), Attorney J. Kirk McGill added to party James Milton(pty:dft), Attorney J. Kirk McGill added to party Ronald J. Saffa(pty:dft), Attorney J. Kirk McGill added to party Trust Company of Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney J. Kirk McGill added to party Thomas Wilkens(pty:dft) (McGill, J.)
November 18, 2022 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JP Morgan Private Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Orders, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bank Info, #3 Exhibit 3 - Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter)(Bankler, Christopher)
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE that the instant case has been removed to 5th Circuit, and Demand that the [WD TX] USDC take no further action, no log any further pleadings by Rico Class action defendants pending issuance of Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus by Stephen P. Wallace (cc3)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 Dismissal without Prejudice by Stephen P. Wallace (cc3)
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kevin Stitt. (Ray, Lauren)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren J. Ray on behalf of Kevin Stitt. Attorney Lauren J. Ray added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft) (Ray, Lauren)
November 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Summons Returned Executed and Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Defendants by Stephen P. Wallace (jv2)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 ADVISORY TO THE COURT "Emergency Motions Per FRCP Have been Denied by Chief Judge Garcia after Judicial Notice and Actual Knowledge of Criminal Sanitization & Spoliation of File-Stamped Summons, Ignoring Witness Protection, Making Him A Potential Accessory to Murder, Which the 5th Circuit Chief Judge Richman & Judiciary Committee Have a Non-Discretionary Duty to Assume Original Jurisdiction, for Conspiracy/Deprivation of Rights, Under Color of Law at Title 18 USC; **241 & 242, Sua Sponte" by Stephen P. Wallace. (jv2) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/16/2022) (jv2). (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/16/2022) (jv2).
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for U.S. Attorney and U.S. Postal Inspector to Investigate by Stephen P. Wallace. (dm)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 SECOND EMERGENCY MOTION for Hon. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia to issue the "Witness Protection Order, Sua Sponte", Requested for the ["4th Time"] that will leave Rico Class Action Plaintiff's no other choice but to seek redress from the 5th circuit judiciary committee by Stephen P. Wallace. (cc3)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert Lorton, Sr., James Milton, Morrel Law PLLC, Ronald J. Saffa, Trust Company of Oklahoma, James Weger, Thomas Wilkens. (rn)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hon. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia to issue the "Witness Protection Order, Sua Sponte", Requested since Inception of Rico Class Action Case Filed on October 25th, 2022, and for the state to advance expenses, pending reimbursement to the state by order of Hon. Orlando L. Garcia from State Reparations by Stephen P. Wallace. (cc3)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Stephen P. Wallace.(cc3)
October 31, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen P. Wallace. Jamie Dimon served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022; James M. Inhofe served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022; JP Morgan Private Bank served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022; Kevin Stitt served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(cc3)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 476), filed by Stephen P. Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rn)
October 25, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen P. Wallace. (rn)
October 25, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (rn)
October 25, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. JP Morgan Private Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Private Bank
Represented By: Christopher R. Bankler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Inhofe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Dimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Represented By: Lauren J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust Company of Oklahoma
Represented By: J. Kirk McGill
Represented By: James C. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wilkens
Represented By: James C. Milton
Represented By: J. Kirk McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lorton, Sr.
Represented By: J. Kirk McGill
Represented By: James C. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Milton
Represented By: J. Kirk McGill
Represented By: James C. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Weger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Saffa
Represented By: J. Kirk McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrel Law PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?