Competitive Access Systems, Inc. v. Oracle Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Competitive Access Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Oracle Corporation and Oracle America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00286
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Lifting Stay. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Courtney A. Neufeld. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick D. Richards. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Liang. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harper S. Batts. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Courtney A. Neufeld ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257248) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Patrick D. Richards ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17257182) by on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pogorzelski, Henry)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. . Attorney Henry Pogorzelski added to party Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (pty:pla) (Pogorzelski, Henry)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Ponder for Jeffrey Liang (PHV Attorney) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17247648) by on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Ponder for Harper S. Batts (PHV Attorney) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17247619) by on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Case Transfer and Opening Letter sent to all Counsel. (cr5)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cr5)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Harper S. Batts and Jeffrey Liang for Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (cr5)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Nicholas F. Lenning and Courtney Neufeld, Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (cr5)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Pro Hac Vice Letter to James A. Shimota and Patrick D. Richards, Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (cr5)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (cr5)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas-Marshall Division; Case Number 2:22-cv-00287.
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in the above captioned case are hereby STAYED, and the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER the case without delay to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/16/2023. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Transfer Case to Western District of Texas, Austin Division by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batts, Harper) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill; Andrea Leigh Fair and Claire Abernathy Henry terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2023. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Liang on behalf of All Defendants (Liang, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Notice of Compliance filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Batts, Harper) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Discovery; granting #43 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited Venue Discovery) andJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/11/2023. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Limited Expedited Venue Discovery) and, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shimota, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Banman, #2 Declaration of Robert Groff, #3 Declaration of Christopher Ponder, #4 Exhibit A to Ponder Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Ponder Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Ponder Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Ponder Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Ponder Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Ponder Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Ponder Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Ponder Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Ponder Declaration, #13 Exhibit J to Ponder Declaration, #14 Exhibit K to Ponder Declaration, #15 Exhibit L to Ponder Declaration, #16 Exhibit M to Ponder Declaration, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #38 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/10/2022. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation (Batts, Harper) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc. . (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCOVERY ORDER re #33 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/2/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #32 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.., Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2023., Jury Selection set for 3/4/2024 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 9/22/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 1/8/2024., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/2/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Courtney Neufeld on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9251885. (Neufeld, Courtney) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shimota, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shimota, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Sur-Reply) Sur-replies due by 12/6/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/23/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Batts, Harper) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Sur-Reply) by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2022. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court then gave counsel Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (aeb) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Replies due by 11/22/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/21/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/18/2022. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Joint Notice of Compliance with Standing Order regarding Motions Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter to Court with parties' positions)(Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint Notice of Compliance with Standing Order Regarding Motions Under 35 U.S.C. 101 Letter Brief filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b (6). Plaintiff Competitive Access Systems may reply to defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by or before November 2, 2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/13/2022. (slo, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Duffy Richards on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9148692. (Richards, Patrick) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oracle Corporation for Oracle America, Inc.. (Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle Corporation (Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation (Ponder, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harper S Batts on behalf of Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation (Batts, Harper) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation.( Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Oracle America, Inc. to 10/4/2022; Oracle Corporation to 10/4/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas F. Lenning on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9127296. (Lenning, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James A Shimota on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9124635. (Shimota, James) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint on behalf of Oracle Corporation and Oracle America, Inc. ( Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Oracle America, Inc. to 9/19/2022; Oracle Corporation to 9/19/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Oracle Corporation served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. Oracle America, Inc. served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oracle America, Inc., Oracle Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9040345.), filed by Competitive Access Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Hill, Jack Wesley) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Competitive Access Systems, Inc. v. Oracle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Competitive Access Systems, Inc.
Represented By: James A. Shimota
Represented By: Andrea L. Fair
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Courtney A. Neufeld
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Nicholas F. Lenning
Represented By: Patrick Duffy Richards
Represented By: Henry Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Harper Batts
Represented By: Christopher S. Ponder
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jeffrey Liang
Represented By: Harper S. Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Harper Batts
Represented By: Christopher S. Ponder
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jeffrey Liang
Represented By: Harper S. Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?