Kinect Solar, LLC v. Globus Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kinect Solar, LLC
Defendant: Globus Enterprises, LLC and Quin Rohrer
Case Number: 1:2023cv00674
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff move for default judgment againstDefendants on or before October 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to Globus Enterprises, LLC, Quin Rohrer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 19 EXHIBITS by Kinect Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit N continued, #3 Exhibit O)(dm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 18 Witness List by Kinect Solar, LLC. (dm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction held on 7/13/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm)
July 12, 2023 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Globus Enterprises, LLC, Quin Rohrer. (dm)
July 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Globus Enterprises, LLC and Quin Rohrer by Kinect Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lobas, Richard)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #14 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. After review, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Remote Testimony of Bruce Sanders, (Dkt. 14), is DENIED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (HSlc)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Permit Remote Testimony of Bruce Sanders re #12 Order, Set Hearings by Kinect Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(D'Amura, Richard)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, ( Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2023 at 11:15 AM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 22, 2023 Notice of Correction: re #8 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service. *FOR FUTURE REFERENCE, PLEASE NOTE: The summons return was incorrectly docketed as Certificate of Service. Using the incorrect event has resulted in an Answer Deadline not being created. Event that should have been used is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. (dm)
June 21, 2023 Set Deadlines: Globus Enterprises, LLC answer due 7/10/2023; Quin Rohrer answer due 7/10/2023. (dm)
June 21, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinect Solar, LLC #1 Complaint (D'Amura, Richard)
June 21, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinect Solar, LLC #1 Complaint (D'Amura, Richard)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard T. Lobas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. D'Amura on behalf of Richard T. Lobas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17569853) by on behalf of Kinect Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(D'Amura, Richard)
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. D'Amura on behalf of Richard T. Lobas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17567332) by on behalf of Kinect Solar, LLC. (D'Amura, Richard)
June 20, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. D'Amura on behalf of Richard T. Lobas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17567332) When filing a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the Motion must have the wet signature of the applicant attorney. S/signatures are not accepted. Please refile the Motion along with a Proposed Order. (jv2)
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2)
June 15, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jv2)
June 15, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (jv2)
June 15, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kinect Solar, LLC. (jv2)
June 15, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kinect Solar, LLC. (D'Amura, Richard)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17559891), filed by Kinect Solar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(D'Amura, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinect Solar, LLC v. Globus Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinect Solar, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. D'Amura
Represented By: Lydia R. Zaidman
Represented By: Richard T. Lobas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globus Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quin Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?