Buford v. Walton Texas, LP et al
Plaintiff: John M. Buford
Defendant: Walton Texas, LP, Walton Texas GP, LLC and Walton Global Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01193
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Walton Global Holdings, LLC, Walton Texas GP, LLC, Walton Texas, LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Dial, Karl)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #5 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the amended complaint, (Dkt. 13), the motion to dismiss is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by John M. Buford. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jv2)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amber Marie Morrison for John M. Buford. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine T. Mize for John M. Buford. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Katherine T. Mize; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1323. (jv2)
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Amber Marie Morrison; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1324. (jv2)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Amend entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before November 17, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Amend His Complaint, by John M. Buford. (jv2)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amber Morrison by on behalf of John M. Buford (Filing Fee Due) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jv2)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine T. Mize by on behalf of John M. Buford (Filing Fee Due) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jv2)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Walton Texas GP, LLC, Walton Texas, LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Dial, Karl)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Amber Morrison to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Directing Katherine T. Mize to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walton Texas GP, LLC, Walton Texas, LP (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17946331), filed by Walton Texas GP, LLC, Walton Texas, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D - Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement)(Dial, Karl)
October 3, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
October 3, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buford v. Walton Texas, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Buford
Represented By: Katherine T. Mize
Represented By: Amber Morrison
Represented By: Amber Marie Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Texas, LP
Represented By: Karl G. Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Texas GP, LLC
Represented By: Karl G. Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton Global Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Karl G. Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?