Silva v. Salient Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: Angela Silva
Defendant: SALIENT SYSTEMS CORPORATION
3Rd Party Defendant: ADP TotalSource Inc and ADP TotalSource, Inc
Case Number: 1:2023cv01243
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal - ERISA
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Salient Systems Corporation, re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION for Costs and Actual Expenses filed by Salient Systems Corporation (Bifulco, Gerard)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support, filed by ADP TotalSource, Inc, re #12 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss filed by Third Party Defendant ADP TotalSource, Inc (Stoker, M.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by ADP TotalSource, Inc, re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION for Costs and Actual Expenses filed by Salient Systems Corporation (Stoker, M.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant's reply, if any, in support of its motion to dismiss is due on or before December 4, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response to Motion, #12 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss by ADP TotalSource, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alejo, Brenda)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Salient Systems Corporation, re #12 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss filed by Third Party Defendant ADP TotalSource, Inc (Bifulco, Gerard)
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court and MOTION for Costs and Actual Expenses by Salient Systems Corporation. (Bifulco, Gerard)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss by ADP TotalSource, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoker, M.)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben Dillon for Salient Systems Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
October 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerard Frederick Bifulco on behalf of Benjamin Dillon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18040994) by on behalf of Salient Systems Corporation. (Bifulco, Gerard)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Third-Party Defendant ADP TotalSource, Inc's deadline to respond to Third-Party Plaintiffs Third-Party Petition is ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED pending the Court's ruling on #7 Motion for Extension to File Answer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
October 20, 2023 Filing 8 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Salient Systems Corporation, re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Third Party Defendant ADP TotalSource, Inc (Bifulco, Gerard)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Third-Party Plaintiff's petition on or before November 3, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADP TotalSource, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoker, M.)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADP TotalSource, Inc (Stoker, M.)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by ADP TotalSource, Inc. (Stoker, M.)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Ben Dillon to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal, this filing is deficient for two reasons: 1) Your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on attorneys for plaintiffs, who at the time of filing the Notice of Removal had not been added to the docket and therefore has not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu. State alternate means of service to counsel. 2) The Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because you did not attach the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
October 13, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
October 13, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (kp)
October 13, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Salient Systems Corporation, Angela Silva. (kp)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ADP TotalSource Inc (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17987135), filed by ADP TotalSource Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stoker, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Salient Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Silva
Represented By: Jon Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIENT SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Timothy Cleveland
Represented By: Ben Dillon
Represented By: Gerard Frederick Bifulco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ADP TotalSource Inc
Represented By: M. Wilson Stoker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ADP TotalSource, Inc
Represented By: Brenda Alejo
Represented By: M. Wilson Stoker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?