Pipkin v. Contract Freighters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Larunce Andrew Pipkin
Defendant: Contract Freighters, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv01409
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehic
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING Attorney Kailyn Rivera per #9 Order to File Pro Hac Motion. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Larunce Andrew Pipkin, re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS DEFENSE filed by Defendant John Doe, Defendant Contract Freighters, Inc. and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant's MSJ and Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Plaintiff's First Amended Rule 26(A) Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, Affidavit of Kaitlyn Rivera, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Tinney, Eoin)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Larunce Andrew Pipkin. Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2023. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EOIN TINNEY. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph J. Barrientos as to EOIN TINNEY ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18166050) by on behalf of Larunce Andrew Pipkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrientos, Joseph) Modified on 12/5/2023 to add applicant's name (cc3).
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Barrientos on behalf of Larunce Andrew Pipkin (Barrientos, Joseph)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #13 Notice of Appearance, (cc3)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J. Barrientos on behalf of Larunce Andrew Pipkin. Attorney Joseph J. Barrientos added to party Larunce Andrew Pipkin(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appearance of Counsel Pro Hac Vice)(Barrientos, Joseph)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS DEFENSE by Contract Freighters, Inc., John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Warren, Larry)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Filing State Court Clerk's Record by Contract Freighters, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Warren, Larry)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cr5)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Directing Kaitlyn Rivera to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cr5)
November 16, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
November 16, 2023 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)
November 16, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Contract Freighters, Inc., Larunce Andrew Pipkin. (cr5)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 APPENDIX by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE to Court that all removal documents served on all counsel by Contract Freighters, Inc. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 Defendant, Contract Freighters, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Contract Freighters, Inc..(Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties Certificate of Financially Interested Parties by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 APPENDIX by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 BRIEF in Support of Notice of Removal by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Warren, Larry)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Contract Freighters, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-18112709), filed by Contract Freighters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit)(Warren, Larry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/20/2023 to flatten document) (cr5).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipkin v. Contract Freighters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larunce Andrew Pipkin
Represented By: Eoin Michael Tinney
Represented By: Kaitlyn N. Rivera
Represented By: Joseph J. Barrientos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Freighters, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Warren
Represented By: Randee Jo Williams Koeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?