Golibart et al v. Complete Oilfield Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christian Golibart and Brooklyn Michelle
Defendant: Complete Oilfield Service LLC, Christopher Carman, Nickel Rock LLC, Devonian Services LLC, Horlando Urquidi, O&S Trucking LLC, Endeavor Energy Resources LP, Endeavor Petroleum LLC, Yvette Ochoa, Zackory Ochoa, Martin Ochoa, Complete Oilfield Services, LLC, Nickel Rock, LLC, O&S Trucking, LLC and Endeavor Energy Resources, LP
Intervenor: Tifini Furst, Gayle Havel and Gayle Havel Blum
Case Number: 1:2024cv00020
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Gayle Havel Blum, Tifini Furst, Christian Golibart, Brooklyn Michelle, to #24 Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Sciano, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2024 to correct link (dm).
February 14, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Zavadil Barger on behalf of Nickel Rock, LLC. Attorney Jessica Zavadil Barger added to party Nickel Rock, LLC(pty:dft) (Barger, Jessica)
February 13, 2024 Filing 24 OBJECTION to #20 Report and Recommendations by Nickel Rock, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stinson, Rachel)
February 13, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel H. Stinson on behalf of Nickel Rock, LLC. Attorney Rachel H. Stinson added to party Nickel Rock, LLC(pty:dft) (Stinson, Rachel)
February 6, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Tifini Furst and Gayle Havel Blum, re #17 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions for Improper RemovalOpposed MOTION for Attorney Fees for Improper Removal filed by Plaintiff Christian Golibart Exhibits to Affidavit of Daniel J.T. Sciano (Doc 21-2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Sciano, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2024 to correct filer (dm).
February 5, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Brooklyn Michelle, re #17 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions for Improper RemovalOpposed MOTION for Attorney Fees for Improper Removal filed by Plaintiff Christian Golibart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Roberts, Negin)
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #11 Motion to Remand to State Court.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
January 29, 2024 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Nickel Rock, LLC, re #17 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions for Improper RemovalOpposed MOTION for Attorney Fees for Improper Removal filed by Plaintiff Christian Golibart (Blue, Alexander)
January 26, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gayle Havel Blum, Tifini Furst, Christian Golibart, Brooklyn Michelle, re #11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Intervenor Tifini Furst, Intervenor Gayle Havel Blum, Plaintiff Brooklyn Michelle, Plaintiff Christian Golibart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Original Petition in Intervention, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Curtis Affidavit)(Sciano, Daniel)
January 24, 2024 MOTION REFERRED: referred #17 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions for Improper RemovalOpposed MOTION for Attorney Fees for Improper Removal. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (cc3)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #17 Motion for Sanctions; REFERRING #17 Motion for Attorney Fees entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions and attorney's fees is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions for Improper Removal, Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees for Improper Removal by Christian Golibart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorney Negin Roberts, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions/Attorneys' Fees)(Roberts, Negin)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to AARON VALADEZ. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NEELY R. FORTINBRRY. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 22, 2024 MOTION REFERRED: referred #11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (cc3)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #11 Motion to Remand to State Court entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to remand is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
January 21, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J.T. Sciano Aaron Valadez Pro Hac w Order ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18325615) by on behalf of Gayle Havel Blum, Tifini Furst. (Sciano, Daniel)
January 19, 2024 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nickel Rock, LLC, re #11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Intervenor Tifini Furst, Intervenor Gayle Havel Blum, Plaintiff Brooklyn Michelle, Plaintiff Christian Golibart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Blue, Alexander)
January 17, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexander George Blue as to NEELY R. FORTINBERRY ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18313552) by on behalf of Nickel Rock, LLC. (Blue, Alexander) Modified on 1/18/2024 to add applying attorney's name (cc3).
January 13, 2024 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gayle Havel Blum, Tifini Furst, Christian Golibart, Brooklyn Michelle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Claimant's Motion for Remand)(Roberts, Negin)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Nickel Rock, LLC. (Blue, Alexander)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Aaron Valadez to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Directing Neely Fortinberry to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because you did not attach the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
January 5, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
January 5, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
January 5, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gayle Havel Blum, Tifini Furst, Christian Golibart, Brooklyn Michelle. (kp)
January 5, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Nickel Rock LLC. (Blue, Alexander)
January 5, 2024 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nickel Rock LLC. (Blue, Alexander)
January 5, 2024 Filing 3 APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal by Nickel Rock LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Blue, Alexander)
January 5, 2024 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Nickel Rock LLC. (Blue, Alexander)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nickel Rock LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number BTXWDC-18274016), filed by Nickel Rock LLC.(Blue, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golibart et al v. Complete Oilfield Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Golibart
Represented By: Negin Roberts
Represented By: Daniel J.T. Sciano
Represented By: Alexander Begum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Michelle
Represented By: Negin Roberts
Represented By: Daniel J.T. Sciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Oilfield Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickel Rock LLC
Represented By: Alexander George Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devonian Services LLC
Represented By: John A. Guerra
Represented By: Fred Saporsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horlando Urquidi
Represented By: G. William Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O&S Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Energy Resources LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Petroleum LLC
Represented By: Michael B. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackory Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Oilfield Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickel Rock, LLC
Represented By: Efrain Forte, III
Represented By: Jessica Zavadil Barger
Represented By: Neely Fortinberry
Represented By: Rachel H. Stinson
Represented By: Richard William Espey
Represented By: Alexander George Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O&S Trucking, LLC
Represented By: G. William Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Energy Resources, LP
Represented By: Michael B. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tifini Furst
Represented By: Daniel J.T. Sciano
Represented By: Aaron Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gayle Havel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gayle Havel Blum
Represented By: Daniel J.T. Sciano
Represented By: Aaron Valadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?