Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Toshner et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Daniel Toshner, Lacey Davies, Christopher Reid, Michael Trinh, Roadside Response LLC and Responsible Billing LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00027
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #15 Notice (Other), Your document is deficient as it is requesting relief from the Court. When requesting any relief from the court it shall be submitted in the form of a Motion and be accompanied with a Proposed Order. Please submit your request to the Court in pleading form of a MOTION and docket using the applicable MOTION event and attach a Proposed Order. In addition, the corrected waiver of service is not attached as described. Thank you. (pg)
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Correspondence regarding the Corrected Waiver of Service of Summons as to Defendant, Christopher Reid by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #14 Waiver of Service Executed, (Brady, Hugh)
February 14, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Defendant, Christopher Reid (Brady, Hugh)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Lacey Davies. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
February 1, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Michael Trinh. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
February 1, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Christopher Reid. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Responsible Billing LLC. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Roadside Response LLC. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company as to Daniel Toshner. Waiver sent on 1/16/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Brady, Hugh)
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pg)
January 9, 2024 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, the requested summons cannot be issued because you listed multiple defendants on the same summons. Each defendant is issued a separate summons. Please resubmit your request with one summons per defendant. You may include multiple summonses within a single PDF document/request. (kp)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of No Liability Insurance by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Brady, Hugh)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18282425), filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Brady, Hugh)
January 9, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
January 9, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (kp)
January 9, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Toshner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh C.M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Hugh C.M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh C.M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh C.M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Hugh C.M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Toshner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadside Response LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Responsible Billing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?