United States of America v. Allen
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Kelly Allen
Case Number: 1:2024cv00248
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Bass, Steven)
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 Signed Returned Certified Mailing of #2 Order to Show Cause, #3 Certified Mail Receipt (pg)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order to Show Cause (pg)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Kelly Allen. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/14/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(cr5)
March 6, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
March 6, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Steven B. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?