AccuSource HR, Inc. v. Lone Star Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AccuSource HR, Inc.
Defendant: Lone Star Holdings, LLC doing business as LSO formerly known as Lone Star Overnight, LLC, Lone Star Overnight, LLC and LSO, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00303
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jay J. Madrid ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18778429) by on behalf of AccuSource HR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madrid, Jay)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Adam Buc to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Adam Buck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff by Jay J. Madrid ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18756387) by on behalf of AccuSource HR, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order)(Madrid, Jay) Modified on 5/14/2024 to add applicant's name (klw).
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorney and Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Jay J. Madrid is SUBSTITUTED as lead counsel for Plaintiff and H. Joseph Acosta is WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiff. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
May 10, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jay J. Madrid, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney H. Joseph Acosta by AccuSource HR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madrid, Jay)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LSO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Schouest, Brett)
April 15, 2024 NOTICE to Joseph Acosta re #6 Acknowledgment of Service Returned, #7 Acknowledgment of Service Returned. The court accepts your filing of these documents but advises you that the proper event to docket an executed summons is Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. Using the proper event will also compute the answer deadline. (klw)
April 12, 2024 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Service returned by AccuSource HR, Inc.. LSO, Inc. served on 4/8/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Acosta, Joseph)
April 12, 2024 Filing 6 Acknowledgment of Service returned by AccuSource HR, Inc.. Lone Star Holdings, LLC served on 4/8/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Acosta, Joseph)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LSO, Inc., Lone Star Holdings, LLC. (klw)
March 27, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AccuSource HR, Inc.. (Acosta, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by AccuSource HR, Inc.. (Acosta, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Complaint, the Complaint you filed is deficient because the JS44 is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the JS44 using the event located at Civil Events -Other Filings - Other Documents - JS44. This form is required for civil cases filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18562128), filed by AccuSource HR, Inc..(Acosta, Joseph)
March 22, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
March 22, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AccuSource HR, Inc.. (kp)
March 22, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AccuSource HR, Inc. v. Lone Star Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Holdings, LLC doing business as LSO formerly known as Lone Star Overnight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Overnight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSO, Inc.
Represented By: Brett W. Schouest
Represented By: Sabrina Nichole Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AccuSource HR, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Acosta
Represented By: Adam Buck
Represented By: Jay J. Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?