Thompson et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Hardy E Thompson, III and Susan Thompson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2024cv00454
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 7/29/2024. (dm)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the United States shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before July 29, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
June 10, 2024 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for one month by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perez de la Cruz, Ignacio)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hardy E Thompson, III, Susan Thompson. United States of America served on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Milvenan, Richard)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ignacio Perez de la Cruz on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Ignacio Perez de la Cruz added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Perez de la Cruz, Ignacio)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kp)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hardy E Thompson, III, Susan Thompson. (Milvenan, Richard)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Plaintiffs' Original Complaint) ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18698452), filed by Hardy E Thompson, III, Susan Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milvenan, Richard)
April 26, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
April 26, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardy E Thompson, III
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Represented By: Robert E. Reetz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Thompson
Represented By: Austin Lewis Jones
Represented By: Richard D. Milvenan
Represented By: Robert E. Reetz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ignacio Perez de la Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?