Mello v. United Medical Centers

Plaintiff: Estella Mello
Defendant: United Medical Centers
Case Number: 2:2018cv00067
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Victor R Garcia
Referring Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel R. Dutko (Dutko, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 3/29/2019, ADR Mediation Completed by 4/11/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2019, Discovery due by 9/4/2019, Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2019, Motions due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (je)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Agreed Scheduling Order by United Medical Centers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order)(Perez, Raquel)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order(s) on or before December 26, 2018, and shall confer as provided in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) on or before December 19, 2018. In drafting the scheduling proposal(s), the parties shall employ the form found in Appendix B of the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ss)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES AVAILABILITY (ss)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by United Medical Centers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez, Raquel)
November 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jaw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Filing and Service in Connection with Notice of Removal by United Medical Centers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perez, Raquel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Medical Centers (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11478331), filed by United Medical Centers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Perez, Raquel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mello v. United Medical Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Medical Centers
Represented By: Raquel Garza Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Mello
Represented By: Daniel R. Dutko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?