Rodriguez v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Elida Rodriguez
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alia Moses
Referring Judge: Collis White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/13/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2019, Discovery due by 2/21/2020, Motions due by 2/21/2020,. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ss)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to supplement entered by Judge Collis White. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties by Elida Rodriguez. (Salinas, Marco)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ortiz, Ray)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ortiz, Ray)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to supplement Notice of Removal with State Court Papers by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Supplement). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Ortiz, Ray)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Elida Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Salinas, Marco)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ortiz, Ray)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Jonathan Law by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Ortiz, Ray)
May 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (ccr)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ccr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12160121), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition Seeking Declaratory Judgment, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Original Answer and Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit TDI - SFFC, #7 Exhibit List of Parties and Counsel)(Ortiz, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Rodriguez
Represented By: Marco A. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ray R. Ortiz
Represented By: Jonathan W. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?