Rodriguez v. Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Del Rio
Plaintiff: Eliza Rodriguez
Defendant: Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Del Rio and Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Victor R Garcia
Referring Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES AVAILABILITY. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Attorney Lawrence D. Smith added to party Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc.(pty:dft) by Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc..(Smith, Lawrence)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliza Rodriguez. Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Spencer, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Del Rio. (jaw)
July 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jaw)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eliza Rodriguez. (Spencer, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12307107), filed by Eliza Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spencer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Del Rio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc. d/b/a Toyota of Del Rio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khoury Automotive of Del Rio, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliza Rodriguez
Represented By: Jennifer Jackson Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?