RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC v. Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Plaintiff: RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Victor R Garcia
Referring Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Scott Fraley on behalf of Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. Attorney R. Scott Fraley added to party Mid-Continent Casualty Co.(pty:dft) (Fraley, R.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC.(Downing, Charles)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Poteet, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC by Mid-Continent Casualty Co..(Poteet, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
July 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jaw)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mid-Continent Casualty Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12361215), filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Poteet, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC v. Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARZ ENTERPRISE LLC
Represented By: Charles W. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Mid-Continent Casualty Co.
Represented By: Timothy Poteet
Represented By: David E. Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?