Palmer v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: John J Palmer
Defendant: Mario Cardenas, United States Postal Service and American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass
Case Number: 2:2021cv00030
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alia Moses
Referring Judge: Collis White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John J Palmer.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (ls)
August 10, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass, Mario Cardenas. Bound and tabbed Court Copy received of #13 Motion to Dismiss (ls)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 Response to Notice of Removal by John J Palmer (ls)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J Palmer. United States Postal Service served on 7/28/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (ls)
August 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mario Cardenas served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (ls)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (ls)
August 5, 2021 NOTICE re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Please provide a bound and tabbed Court Copy for Judge's review. (ls)
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass, Mario Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Holder, Matthew)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw, Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Bloodworth, Kristin)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Mario Cardenas. (ls)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass. (ls)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ls)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by United States Postal Service Advisory to the Court re Service on Defendant USPS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bloodworth, Kristin)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J Palmer. American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass and Mario Cardenas served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (ls) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (ls).
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John J Palmer. United States Postal Service served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (ls)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically by John J Palmer.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (ls)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by John J Palmer.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (ls)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by John J Palmer.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (ls)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Bloodworth, Kristin)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service (Filing fee $402), filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Bloodworth, Kristin)
July 1, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ls)
July 1, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Cardenas
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Kristin K. Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Postal Workers Union Eagle Pass
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?