Estrada v. Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Erik Estrada
Defendant: Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas and Department of Indian Child Welfare Services
Guardian Ad Litem: Richard Crow
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ivan Torres, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00055
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Brief Regarding Standing and Intervenor's Responsive Brief on Standing by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas. (Baumgartner, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 30 BRIEF Intervenor's Responsive Brief on Standing regarding #29 Trial Brief by Ivan Torres, Jr.. (Schroeter, Frances)
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 TRIAL BRIEF On Standing by Erik Estrada. (Davidson, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2021 Filing 28 Exhibit and Witness List.(ls)
October 16, 2021 Filing 27 Proceedings held before Judge Alia Moses: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/16/2021 (Court Reporter Vickie Garza.)(ls)
October 16, 2021 #27 Plaintiff's brief due 10/29/2021, Response due 1 week later (ls)
October 16, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE Defendant's Errata to ECF #18 filed October 8, 2021 by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum for Erik Estrada Returned Unexecuted. (ls)
October 14, 2021 Filing 24 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Erik Estrada for 10/16/2021 at 1:30 pm. (ls)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ls)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Erik Estrada to testify by Erik Estrada. (Torres, Gregory)
October 13, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Erik Estrada to testify by Erik Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torres, Gregory)
October 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE Subpoena to Appear Ivan Torres by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas (Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE Subpoena to Appear to Erik Estrada by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas (Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas, re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Entry of Order Without Necessity of a Hearing filed by Plaintiff Erik Estrada (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 TRIAL BRIEF On the Merits by Erik Estrada. (Davidson, Elizabeth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 COMPLAINT in Intervention ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15315017). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ivan Torres, Jr..(Schroeter, Frances)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF on Merits of Plaintiffs Motion by Ivan Torres, Jr.. (Schroeter, Frances)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 Electronic Notification to Attorneys of #13 Order on Motion to Continue, Order on Motion to Intervene (ls)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Continue: Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 10/16/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alia Moses ; GRANTING #12 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ls)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION To Intervene by Ivan Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schroeter, Frances)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas, re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Entry of Order Without Necessity of a Hearing filed by Plaintiff Erik Estrada (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Petition for Guardianship, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Petition for Emergency TRO, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Consent for Medical Treatment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Emergency Temporary Orders)(Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing-Motion to Dissolve TRO Order by Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew B. Baumgartner on behalf of Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas. Attorney Matthew B. Baumgartner added to party Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas(pty:dft) (Baumgartner, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 Electronic Notification to Attorneys of #5 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #6 Scheduling Order (ls)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Priscilla Puente-Chacon on behalf of Erik Estrada. Attorney Priscilla Puente-Chacon added to party Erik Estrada(pty:pla) (Puente-Chacon, Priscilla)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ls)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (ls)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Indian Child Welfare Services, Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas. (ls)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Entry of Order Without Necessity of a Hearing by Erik Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Davidson, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Erik Estrada. (Davidson, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15296513), filed by Erik Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ls)
October 5, 2021 #5 Set Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/7/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alia Moses (ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Estrada
Represented By: Gregory D. Torres
Represented By: Priscilla Puente-Chacon
Represented By: Elizabeth Conry Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kickapoo Traditional Tribe of Texas
Represented By: Matthew B. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Indian Child Welfare Services
Represented By: Matthew B. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Richard Crow
Represented By: Richard R. Crow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ivan Torres, Jr.
Represented By: Frances Gail Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?