Hernandez, et al. vs The United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Guere Bentacour and Jesus C Hernandez
Defendant: The United States of America, United States Border Patrol, United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, United States Depatment of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency and Unknown Named Agents of the United States Border Patrol
Case Number: 3:2011cv00027
Filed: January 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: El Paso Office
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar, )
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jesus Mesa, Jr, The United States of America, United States Border Patrol, United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, United States Depatment of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency, Unknown Named Agents of the United States Border Patrol, Maria Guadalupe Guere Bentacour and Jesus C Hernandez. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar, ) **Related Case: EP-11-CV-331-DB***
June 27, 2011 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States of America, United States Border Patrol, United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, United States Depatment of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency, Unknown Named Agents of the United States Border Patrol amending, filed by Maria Guadalupe Guere Bentacour, Jesus C Hernandez.(lc3, )
January 17, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-3334800), filed by Jesus C Hernandez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Appendix Summons to DHS, # 5 Appendix Summons to Border Patrol, # 6 Appendix Summons to USCBP, # 7 Appendix Summons to DOJ, # 8 Appendix Summons to ICE, # 9 Appendix Summons to Unknown Agent, # 10 Appendix Summons to USA)(Hilliard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez, et al. vs The United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Guere Bentacour
Represented By: Cristobal M. Galindo
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus C Hernandez
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr.
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Cristobal M. Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Border Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Depatment of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Agents of the United States Border Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?