State of Texas v. Ysleta Del Sur Pueblo et al
Plaintiff: |
State of Texas |
Defendant: |
The Tribal Council, Tribal Governor Carlos Hisa or His Successor and Ysleta Del Sur Pueblo |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00179 |
Filed: |
June 7, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Texas |
Office: |
El Paso Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip R. Martinez |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
25 U.S.C. § 1300 Texas Restoration Act-Gaming Activities |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2019 |
Filing
183
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 4, 2019, trial setting in this matter is VACATED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, in light of this Memorandum Opinion, each party may draft and submit a proposed permanent injunction, if it so chooses, by March 1, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
176
ORDER GRANTING 147 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
|
May 23, 2018 |
Filing
96
ORDER GRANTING 85 Motion to Compel; MOOTING 89 Motion for Authorization of Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Ysleta del SurPueblo, the Tribal Counsel, and the Tribal Governor Carlos Hisa,RESPOND to Plaintiffs discovery requests re lating to operations atSpeaking Rock and the functionality of the electronic bingo machines onor before June 6, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Ysleta del SurPueblo, the Tribal Counsel, and the Tribal Governor Carlos Hisa mustproduce all documents that are in the actual possession of the FraternalOrganization that are responsive to Plaintiffs discovery requestsrelating to operations at Speaking Rock and the functionality of theelectronic bingo machines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery-relateddeadlines, including the dispositive motion deadline, are herebyEXTENDED an additional THIRTY (30) DAYS to allow both partiesto comply with the provisions of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Ysleta del Sur Pueblo, the Tribal Counsel, and the Tribal Governor Carlos Hisas failure to comply with the Courts order may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
77
ORDER Accepting insofar as it recommends denying preliminary injunctive relief, but REJECTED in its proposed reasoning, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 64 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED, filed by State of Texas. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mt)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing
76
ORDER DENYING 13 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?