Dishon v. Dishon

Plaintiff: Caroline Dishon
Defendant: Brett Dishon
Case Number: 3:2018cv00275
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE: REPLY RECEIVED REMAND OF CASE BY Superior Court in Maricopa County, State of Arizona, re #5 Order (mg2)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 Certified RETURN/RECD Mail Receipt of #5 Order (mg2)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt of #8 Order Striking Pleading (mg2)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Striking Pleading [REPLY TO ORDER TO REMAND CASE]. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Order. Sent regular and certified mail. (mg2)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Certified RETURN/RECD Mail Receipt of #3 Order (mg2)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO REMAND CASE to the Superior Court of Arizona in Maricopa County, under Cause Number CV2017-016245. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mp)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Order (mg2)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER TO REPLEAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
September 20, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bg2)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Gil Hacohen (bg2)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brett Dishon. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Order Granting, #2 Order Granting, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental CV Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of filing, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(bg2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dishon v. Dishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Dishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Dishon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?