Permula Corporation v. Pacheco
Appellee: Helson Pacheco
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellant: Permula Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00288
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 12/31/2018, (lc3)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court - Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of the Record, #2 Individual Designations (Except for Restricted Transcript No. 80), #3 Restricted Transcript (No. 80)) (Lawson, Rob)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court - Appellant's Designation of the Record on Appeal is Complete. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of the Record, #2 Individual Designations, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (Lawson, Rob)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Permula Corporation (lc3)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Appellee's Designation Of Additional Contents Of The Record by Helson Pacheco. (Kirk, E.P.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Designation of Record and Statement of Issues by Permula Corporation (lc3)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Permula Corporation. (Attachments: #1 document)(lc3)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gerry Linan for Permula Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 300032583) by Permula Corporation. (Attachments: #1 RECEIPT)(lc3)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Gerry Linan. (bg2)
October 3, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bg2)
October 3, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Orders being Appealed, #2 USBK Docket Report, #3 List of Parties, #4 Letter of Transmittal) (tr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Permula Corporation v. Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Helson Pacheco
Represented By: E.P. Bud Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Permula Corporation
Represented By: Gerry Linan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?