Draper v. Commonwealth of Virginia Chesterfield Police Dept. Property
Plaintiff: Richard A. Draper
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia Chesterfield Police Dept. Property
Case Number: 3:2018cv00334
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION, filed by Richard A. Draper.(jg1)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Letter/Correspondence from Richard A. Draper regarding Return of Property (mt)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Letter/Correspondence regarding Weapons Training from Richard A. Draper. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document)(mt)
November 2, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard A. Draper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Complaint and Request for Injunction, #4 Affidavit)(mn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: #5 Exhibit) (mn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. Commonwealth of Virginia Chesterfield Police Dept. Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia Chesterfield Police Dept. Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?