Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc. v. Azar
Plaintiff: Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2018cv00340
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion for Reconsideration. Further directives within Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kennedy, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Mark)
November 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alex M. Azar, II answer due 1/7/2019. (em)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian M. McLin on behalf of Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. Attorney Ian M. McLin added to party Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.(pty:pla) (McLin, Ian)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. Alex M. Azar, II served on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/19. (Kennedy, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2018 (em).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL RETAIN local counsel as soon as possible, but in no event later than December 15, 2018. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #5 First Amended Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Scott, C.)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #2 Motion for TRO in light of #5 Amended Motion for TRO, entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wk)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Scott, C.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Scott, C.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mn)
November 6, 2018 Remark : All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso. (mn)
November 6, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
November 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Kennedy, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Scott, C.)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11423882). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wheelchair and Walker Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Lurese A. Terrell
Represented By: Joanna Hojdus Martin
Represented By: C. Trey Scott
Represented By: Mark S. Kennedy
Represented By: Ian M. McLin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?