Kimble v. Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Wronie Kimble
Defendant: Chad Harris, Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Competitive Edge Research & Comm and Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00347
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines to Complete Arbitration by Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Chad Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Chad Harris. (Dore, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Case Stayed (jg1)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Chad Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Dore, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/17/2018,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
November 13, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (scf)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Competitive Edge Research & Comm, Chad Harris.(Dore, Mark)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chad Harris, Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Competitive Edge Research & Comm (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11448964), filed by Chad Harris, Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Competitive Edge Research & Comm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Dore, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wronie Kimble
Represented By: Daniela Labinoti
Represented By: Brett Allen Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Harris
Represented By: Mark D. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Competitive Edge Research & Comm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitive Edge Research & Communication, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?