Padilla v. Lyca Tel, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Maria De La Luz Padilla
Defendant: Lyca Tel, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00351
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/22/2019, Jury Trial set for 10/15/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Frank Montalvo, ADR Report Deadline due by 6/17/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2019, Discovery due by 5/16/2019, Motions due by 7/15/2019,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (scf)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Scheduling Order by Lyca Tel, L.L.C.. (Dore, Mark)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Maria De La Luz Padilla confer with Defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/19/2018. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (scf)
November 16, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bg2)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lyca Tel, L.L.C..(Dore, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lyca Tel, L.L.C. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11466637), filed by Lyca Tel, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Dore, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Lyca Tel, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De La Luz Padilla
Represented By: Michael Robert Anderson
Represented By: Enrique Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyca Tel, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark D. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?