Rodriguez v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lydia Rodriguez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv00385
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Anne T Berton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Anne T. Berton located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (jb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Anne T. Berton for all proceedings. Judge Philip R. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Lin, Mary)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Request for U.S. Marshals Service Expenses in PAUPER Case (mg2)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lydia Rodriguez. The United States Attorney General, c/o Civil Process Clerk served on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (mg2)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lydia Rodriguez. The United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas, c/o Civil Process Clerk served on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (mg2)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lydia Rodriguez. Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration of the United States of America served on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (mg2) .
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (mg2)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas (mg2) .
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg2)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 0 receipt number xxx), filed by Lydia Rodriguez.(mg2)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mp)
December 18, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bg2)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lydia Rodriguez. (Nel-Shankland, Jacqueline)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline F. Nel-Shankland on behalf of Lydia Rodriguez. Attorney Jacqueline F. Nel-Shankland added to party Lydia Rodriguez(pty:pla) (Nel-Shankland, Jacqueline)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lydia Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Order)(Nel-Shankland, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Rodriguez
Represented By: Jacqueline F. Nel-Shankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Mary F. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?