Galindo Madrid v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid
Respondent: U.S Department of Homeland Security, Matthew G. Whitaker, Marc J. Moore and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 3:2018cv00393
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED AS MOOT. All pending motions, if any, are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Marc J. Moore, Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S Department of Homeland Security, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Romero, Manuel)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Hendricks, Douglas)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy Maldonado ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 300033219) by Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Receipt)(mc4)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eduardo Beckett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11612041) by on behalf of Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Beckett, Eduardo)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eduardo Beckett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11612001) by on behalf of Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Beckett, Eduardo)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eduardo Beckett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11611111) by on behalf of Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Beckett, Eduardo)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENTS TO FILE A RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid, BY NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 1, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PETITIONER MAY FILE A REPLY no later than fourteen (14) days after the date of service of the response. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Amy Maldonado.(scf)
December 28, 2018 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (bg2)
December 28, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (bg2)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORAL ARGUMENT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (bg2)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 300033077), filed by Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-6, #3 Exhibit 7, #(4) Exhibit 8, #5 Receipt)(bg2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galindo Madrid v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marc J. Moore
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yeimi Damari Galindo Madrid
Represented By: Eduardo Beckett
Represented By: Melissa Victoria Perez Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas Lynn Hendricks
Represented By: Claudia Maria Vetesi
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?