The Hanover Insurance Company v. Coastal Environmental Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Coastal Environmental Group, Inc., Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture, Richard C Silva, Tigua, Inc. and Subsidiaries, Enviroworks, LLC and Tigua Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Tigua Enterprises, Inc.. (mc4)
March 6, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Enviroworks, LLC. (mc4)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion to Amend Complaint As A Matter Of Course Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B) entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend Complaint As A Matter Of Course Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B); Or In The Alternative, Pursuant To Party Agreement Under Rule 15(a)(2) by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bains, Brandon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Coastal Environmental Group, Inc. (mc4)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture (mc4)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #16 Amended Complaint. Pleading requires a Motion for Leave to Amend and attach the Amended Complaint for the Court's review (mc4)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Discovery by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Granting Hanover's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery)(Bains, Brandon)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Tigua, Inc. and Subsidiaries (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Denying Tigua's Motion to Dismiss)(Bains, Brandon)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Bains, Brandon) Modified on 2/27/2019 (mc4). Modified on 3/4/2019 (mc4).
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default against Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Proposed Order of Entry of Default)(Bains, Brandon)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Pretrial Order of Entry of Default (Coastal) by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default against Coastal Environmental Group, Inc. by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Bains, Brandon)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Bains, Brandon)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed by The Hanover Insurance Company. Coastal Environmental Group, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Bains, Brandon)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tigua, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order C)(Ortega, Francisco)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tigua, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (mc4)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Richard C Silva. (em)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Coastal Environmental Group, Inc.. (em)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Enviroworks, LLC. (em)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture. (em)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
January 7, 2019 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (bg2)
January 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bg2)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Bains, Brandon)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11618305). No Summons requested at this time, filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bains, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hanover Insurance Company v. Coastal Environmental Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon K. Bains
Represented By: William B. Beasley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Environmental Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal-Enviroworks Joint Venture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigua, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Represented By: Francisco Javier Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enviroworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tigua Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?