Gallegos v. Davis
Petitioner: Francisco Gallegos
Respondent: David Lofton and Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00053
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 300033851 (scf)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Return Receipt of #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (scf)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Mail Receipt of #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mm1)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Petitioner to pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (mm1)
February 12, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (scf)
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 1:19-cv-00018.
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Western District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/12/2019) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]
February 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Fri Feb 8 11:23:06 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Francisco Gallegos. (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Francisco Gallegos. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (jak) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Lofton
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?