High Desert Investors 3, LLC v. AEW Value Investors II, L.P.
Plaintiff: HIGH DESERT INVESTORS 3, LLC
Defendant: AEW VALUE INVESTORS II, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00148
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Discovery; GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional Discovery), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's July 3 Order by High Desert Investors 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Plaintiff to either demonstrate diversity jurisdiction orotherwise amend the complaint to establish the subject matter jurisdiction of this Court on or before July 10, 2019. re #5 Notice (Other) filed by High Desert Investors 3, LLC. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of List of Members/Partners of the Parties by High Desert Investors 3, LLC (Walker, Mark)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff submit written notice identifying each ofthe members of High Desert Investors 3, LLC, the partners of AEW Value Investors II, L.P., and their citizenship by June 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AEW VALUE INVESTORS II, L.P.. (mn)
June 5, 2019 Remark: All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (mn)
June 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HIGH DESERT INVESTORS 3, LLC. (Walker, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12191440), filed by HIGH DESERT INVESTORS 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Desert Investors 3, LLC v. AEW Value Investors II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGH DESERT INVESTORS 3, LLC
Represented By: Mario Franke
Represented By: Mark C. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEW VALUE INVESTORS II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?