Hernandez v. Pacific

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hernandez
Defendant: Pacific Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned cause isDISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all settings in this matter are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this cause, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #10 Stipulation filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all settings in this matter are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this cause, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bueche, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATIVE TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff ensure that the Final Judgment, Non-Suit, Stipulation of Dismissal, or any other appropriate document with all required signatures be presented to the Court forsignature and entry no later than July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Bueche, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Fed Ex Delivery Receipt of #5 Letter/Correspondence (dt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Fed Ex Mail Receipt of #5 Letter/Correspondence (dt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter (dt) Modified on 6/18/2019 (dt).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL.Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Elizabeth Hernandez andDefendant Pacific Specialty Insurance Company RETAIN local counsel as soon aspossible, but in no event later than July 8, 2019.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 7/8/2019,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER TO REPELAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
June 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (mn)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12192756), filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Bueche, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hernandez
Represented By: Larry W. Lawrence, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Allen Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Chad Geisler
Represented By: Ryan C. Bueche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?