Meshel, M.D. v. East El Paso Medical Surgical Center d/b/a East El Paso Physician's Medical Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Meshel, M.D.
Defendant: East El Paso Medical Surgical Center d/b/a East El Paso Physician's Medical Center, LLC and Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00181
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Parties to File a Proposed Scheduling Order and a Joint Report. Scheduling recommendations/joint report due to the Court by 9/8/2019. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff William Meshel's claims against Defendant Southwest Medical Associates, Inc. are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum Order to file an amended complaint to cure the pleading deficiencies discussed above. Failure to do so will result in Dismissal. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by William Meshel, M.D., re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Southwest Medical Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 of Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 of Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 of Proposed Amended Complaint)(Cordero, Isaac)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Sealed Document filed (em)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (je)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Amanda)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to #6 Response to Motion, by East El Paso Medical Surgical Center d/b/a East El Paso Physician's Medical Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Amanda)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by William Meshel, M.D., re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Southwest Medical Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed First Amended Complaint Ex A-1, #3 Proposed First Amended Complaint Ex A-2, #4 Proposed First Amended Complaint Ex A-3)(Cordero, Isaac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc..(Carter, Aaron)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.. (Carter, Aaron)
July 3, 2019 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (scf)
July 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.. (Carter, Aaron)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.. (Carter, Aaron)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12311958), filed by Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Amended Petition - State, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet - State)(Carter, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meshel, M.D. v. East El Paso Medical Surgical Center d/b/a East El Paso Physician's Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East El Paso Medical Surgical Center d/b/a East El Paso Physician's Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Victor N. Corpuz
Represented By: Amanda A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Medical Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Craig Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Meshel, M.D.
Represented By: Isaac A. Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?