St. Pierre v. City of El Paso, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa St. Pierre
Defendant: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company and City of El Paso, Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv00223
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Withdrawing Motion to Remand by Vanessa St. Pierre re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum (Milligan, Mike)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum by Vanessa St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milligan, Mike)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vanessa St. Pierre. (Milligan, Mike)
August 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (jg1)
August 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company, City of El Paso, Texas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12476874), filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company, City of El Paso, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(MacRae, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Pierre v. City of El Paso, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew F. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of El Paso, Texas
Represented By: Andrew F. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa St. Pierre
Represented By: Mike Milligan
Represented By: Leticia Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?