Saulsbury Industries, Inc. v. Western Refining Southwest Inc.
Plaintiff: Saulsbury Industries, Inc.
Counter Plaintiff: Western Refining Southwest Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00224
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Mitchell, Paul)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Mitchell, Paul)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Saulsbury Industries, Inc.. (Taylor, Tory)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tory Ford Taylor on behalf of Saulsbury Industries, Inc. (Taylor, Tory)
September 26, 2019 ***Attorney Tory Ford Taylor for Saulsbury Industries, Inc.,Tory Ford Taylor for Saulsbury Industries, Inc. added., *** Attorney Jeffrey T. Lucky terminated. (mc4)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Saulsbury Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Tory)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Proposed Scheduling Order and Joint report filing deadline reset to 10/25/2019. As per text order by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and a Joint Report by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Paul)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Hood, Jr on behalf of Western Refining Southwest Inc.. Attorney Joseph L. Hood, Jr added to party Western Refining Southwest Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Joseph L. Hood, Jr added to party Western Refining Southwest Inc.(pty:dft) (Hood, Joseph)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Western Refining Southwest, Inc. to RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL no later than 9/25/19. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File a Proposed Scheduling Order and a Joint Report for the Court' consideration by 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Sealed Exhibit #3 filed (mc4)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Paul)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to File Exhibit 3 to Defendant's Original Answer, Affirmative Defenses, & Original Counterclaims Under Seal by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Seal)(Mitchell, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Western Refining Southwest, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Saulsbury Industries, Inc. by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Amendment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Proposal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Purchase Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Change Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-Change Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Purchase Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8-Change Order, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Change Order)(Mitchell, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Mitchell, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Remark: All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (mn)
August 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (mn)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western Refining Southwest Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12478330), filed by Western Refining Southwest Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saulsbury Industries, Inc. v. Western Refining Southwest Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Western Refining Southwest Inc.
Represented By: Paul L. Mitchell
Represented By: Nicholas Zugaro
Represented By: Joseph L. Hood, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E. Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saulsbury Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Tory Ford Taylor
Represented By: Valarie J. Eissler
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Lucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?