Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2019,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Manuel Romero added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Romero, Manuel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc.. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Coyle, Lynn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mn)
August 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (mn)
August 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc.. (Coyle, Lynn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12516092). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coyle, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diocesan Migrant & Refugee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn A. Coyle
Represented By: Christopher Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?