M.B.S. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.,
Petitioner: M. B-S.
Respondent: Matthew Albence, United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas, Corey Price, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2019cv00249
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Case Stayed (jg1)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay by Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas. (Romero, Manuel)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Matthew Albence answer due 10/24/2019; William Barr answer due 10/24/2019; Kevin McAleenan answer due 10/24/2019; Corey Price answer due 10/24/2019; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 10/24/2019; United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas answer due 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Romero, Manuel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2019,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dc)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric B. Kingsley for M. B-S.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 receipt# 500051079) (jg1).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Liane Katzenstein for M. B-S.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 receipt #500051078) (jg1).
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by M. B-S..(jg1)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Eric B. Kingsley and Liane Katzenstein Ly. (scf)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas and U.S. Attorney (dc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by M. B-S.. (Wedemeyer, Jacob)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. B-S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(scf)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. B-S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(scf)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by M. B-S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(scf)
September 5, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (scf)
September 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.B.S. v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Attorney for the Western District of Texas
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corey Price
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: M. B-S.
Represented By: Eric B. Kingsley
Represented By: Jacob Wedemeyer
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?