Moore v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Proctection and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00279
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Romero, Manuel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Coyle, Lynn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Moore. U.S. Customs and Border Proctection served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Coyle, Lynn)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Attorney General of the United States, C/O Attorney General of the United States, Washington, DC. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, c/o General Counsel, Washington, DC. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, c/o Ms. Stephanie Rico Civil Process Clerk. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, c/o Attorney General of the United States. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, c/o Office of the General Counsel, Washington, DC. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Proctection, c/o. Ms. Stephanie Rico Civil Process Clerk (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, c/o Attorney General, Washington, D.C. (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, C/O. Office of the General Counsel (em)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (em)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn)
October 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
October 1, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
October 1, 2019 https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/index.html (scf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Robert Moore. (Coyle, Lynn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12674340). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Robert Moore.(Coyle, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Proctection
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Lynn A. Coyle
Represented By: Christopher Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?