U.S Bank National Association, v. Lutrick et al
Plaintiff: U.S Bank National Association,
Defendant: Terri Kelley Lutrick, Bryan Prather, Jr, Nicole Prather, Colt Prather and Bryan Prather
Case Number: 3:2019cv00281
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 ADVISORY TO COUNSELS. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by U.S Bank National Association, in Response to Advisory to Counsel and Order. (Green, Gordon)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADVISORY TO COUNSEL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Final Judgment by U.S Bank National Association,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Green, Gordon)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Terri Kelley Lutrick answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Terri Kelley Lutrick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Bryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S Bank National Association,. Nicole Prather served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Green, Gordon)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S Bank National Association,. Terri Kelley Lutrick served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Green, Gordon)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Terri Kelley Lutrick, Bryan Prather, Colt Prather, Nicole Prather, Bryan Prather, Jr. (scf)
October 4, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
October 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by U.S Bank National Association,. (All Defendants) (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12689942). No Summons requested at this time, filed by U.S Bank National Association,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S Bank National Association, v. Lutrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Kelley Lutrick
Represented By: Bryan Harris Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Prather, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S Bank National Association,
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Gordon W. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?