SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC. v. GONZALEZ
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.
Counter Plaintiff: JAVIER W. GONZALEZ
Case Number: 3:2019cv00329
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING #25 Amended Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Superior Sales West, Inc., re #25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Superior Sales West, Inc. (Walker, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Javier W. Gonzalez, re #25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Superior Sales West, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Javier Gonzalez, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Superior Sales West, Inc..(Walker, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to #25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Superior Sales West, Inc.. (Walker, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant to file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is EXTENDED to December 27, 2019. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
December 16, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Javier W. Gonzalez for proceedings held on December 3, 2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Rhonda McCay. (Martinez, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Javier W. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER)(Martinez, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 27 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 12.03.2019, Proceedings Transcribed: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER & PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rhonda McCay, Telephone number: 915-544-1515. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/3/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2020, (McCay, Rhonda)
December 13, 2019 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT to #25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Superior Sales West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gregory Brown, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walker, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Superior Sales West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Fred Persch, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Tonya Hintze, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Walker, Mark)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Superior Sales West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2)(Walker, Mark)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's Original Answer and Counterclaim ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney James Allen Martinez added to party Javier W. Gonzalez(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Superior Sales West, Inc. by Javier W. Gonzalez.(Martinez, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Superior Sales West, Inc. (Attachments: #1 3a, #2 3aa, #3 3b, #4 4, #5 5)(dc)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Superior Sales West, Inc. for proceedings held on 12/03/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Order to Show Cause.. (Walker, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 Witness List as to Superior Sales West, Inc. vs. Javier W. Gonzalez. (dc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen Cardone: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 12/3/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ECRO.)(dc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/3/2019 3:14:25 PM ]. File Size [ 56714 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:58:09 ]. (HEARING ON TRO (PART 2)). (admin).
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/3/2019 1:50:56 PM ]. File Size [ 37897 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:18:57 ]. (HEARING ON TRO (PART 1)). (admin).
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Superior Sales West, Inc. #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walker, Mark)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Superior Sales West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Walker, Mark)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Superior Sales West, Inc. #8 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7), #1 Complaint, #5 Certificate of Counsel, #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark C. Walker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12849697) , #10 Memorandum in Support, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Superior Sales West, Inc.. Javier W. Gonzalez served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Federal Express Proof of Delivery)(Brown, Gregory)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Brown on behalf of Superior Sales West, Inc. (Brown, Gregory)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Amaended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gregory Brown may appear on behalf of Plaintiff in the above-captioned case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Gregory Brown, if he has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100, made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support of 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit/Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walker, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to JAVIER W. GONZALEZ. (dc)
November 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (jg1)
November 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Walker, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark C. Walker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12849697) by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Walker, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Walker, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mark C. Walker on behalf of SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC. (Walker, Mark)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark C. Walker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12849697) by on behalf of SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Mark) Modified on 11/19/2019 (dc).
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support of 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Vande Guchte, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walker, Mark)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12847949), filed by SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC. v. GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR SALES WEST, INC.
Represented By: Mark C. Walker
Represented By: Gregory Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: JAVIER W. GONZALEZ
Represented By: James Allen Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?