Wicker v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Plaintiff: Thomas George Wicker, Jr
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Counter Defendant: Thomas George Wicker, Jr.
Counter Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 3:2019cv00342
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Judge David Briones. (fm)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 AND LOCAL COURT RULE CV-26. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Thomas George Wicker, Jr, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Thomas George Wicker, Jr (Wicker, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Thomas George Wicker, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas George Wicker, Jr. (Wicker, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Thomas George Wicker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Wicker, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn)
November 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT Correctede Amended Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT Amended Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12891169), filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicker v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas George Wicker, Jr
Represented By: Thomas G. Wicker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Thomas George Wicker, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Wicker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?