Cazares et al v. Ortho El Paso, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Javier Cadena Cazares and Angelina Cazares
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi Genzyme, Aventis Inc., Ortho El Paso, P.A., Sanofi SA, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, Sanofi-Aventis, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi-Aventis LLC and Genco Pharmaceutical Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 1/4/2021 09:00AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, ADR Report Deadline due by 3/26/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2020, Discovery due by 8/26/2020, Motions due by 9/28/2020,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ortho El Paso, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Paul)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Revised in Accordance with Court's February 18, 2020, Order Requiring Amended Joint Case Management Report [ECF No. 8] by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by no later than February 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Javier Cadena Cazares (Auger, Valerie)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan of the Parties by Aventis Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS, CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS, Genco Pharmaceutical Services, Genzyme Biosurgery, Genzyme Corporation, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi SA, Sanofi U.S., Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Auger, Valerie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Javier Cadena Cazares. (Serta, Adam)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Plaintiff and Defendant Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 2/11/2020,Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER TO REPELAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13048731), filed by Sanofi-Aventis, Aventis Inc., Genzyme Corporation, Genzyme Biosurgery, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi Genzyme, Sanofi SA, Sanofi-Aventis LLC, Sanofi Pasteur, Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc., Sanofi U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(mn)
January 8, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (mn)
January 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cazares et al v. Ortho El Paso, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genzyme Biosurgery
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Pasteur
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Genzyme
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho El Paso, P.A.
Represented By: Paul M. Bracken
Represented By: Mark A. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi SA
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Inc. d/b/a CVS
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark, Inc. d/b/a CVS
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genzyme Corporation
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S.
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis LLC
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Represented By: John Scott Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genco Pharmaceutical Services
Represented By: Valerie Renee Auger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Cadena Cazares
Represented By: Russell A. Murray
Represented By: Robert Leon Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Cazares
Represented By: Russell A. Murray
Represented By: Robert Leon Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?