Jerumbo v. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Jerumbo
Defendant: Zimmer U.S., Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer GmbH
Case Number: 3:2020cv00054
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 42 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zimmer GmbH. (Vickery, Alan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Ray Vickery on behalf of Zimmer GmbH. Attorney Alan Ray Vickery added to party Zimmer GmbH(pty:dft) (Vickery, Alan)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J Joseph Tanner for Zimmer Holdings, Inc.,J Joseph Tanner for Zimmer U.S., Inc.,J Joseph Tanner for Zimmer, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie N Russo for Zimmer Holdings, Inc.,Stephanie N Russo for Zimmer U.S., Inc.,Stephanie N Russo for Zimmer, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew L Campbell for Zimmer Holdings, Inc.,Andrew L Campbell for Zimmer U.S., Inc.,Andrew L Campbell for Zimmer, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Ray Vickery for J. Joseph Tanner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13417153) by on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan)
April 2, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Ray Vickery for Stephanie Russo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13417109) by on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan)
April 2, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Ray Vickery for Andrew Campbell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13417060) by on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 34 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Stacy L. Prall. (fm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 33 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Andrew L. Campbell. (fm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 32 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney J Joseph Tanner. (fm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 31 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney John Thomas Schlafer. (fm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 30 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Karen Beyea-Schroeder. (fm)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Ray Vickery on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. Attorney Alan Ray Vickery added to party Zimmer Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Ray Vickery added to party Zimmer U.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Ray Vickery added to party Zimmer, Inc.(pty:dft) (Vickery, Alan)
February 26, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
February 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
February 26, 2020 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:13-cv-05522.
February 26, 2020 Filing 26 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER remanding action to the Western District of Texas, El Paso Division (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 25 SUGGESTION OF REMAND. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/10/20. (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (as, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY SEAN JEZ on behalf of Mary Jerumbo (JEZ, GREGORY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
February 18, 2015 Filing 23 Letter from Karen Beyea-Schroeder Request to Proceed with Discovery in 2:13-cv-05522 and 2:14-cv-01093. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 10, 2014 Case REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo no longer assigned to the case. (gmd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
May 1, 2014 Filing 22 Letter from Karen Beya-Schroeder re #12 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
February 24, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN HOPE BEYEA-SCHROEDER on behalf of Mary Jerumbo (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
October 14, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH TANNER on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER, INC., Zimmer U.S., Inc. (TANNER, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
October 14, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY L. PRALL on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER, INC., Zimmer U.S., Inc. (PRALL, STACY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
October 14, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LORIN CAMPBELL on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER, INC., Zimmer U.S., Inc. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
October 14, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN THOMAS SCHLAFER on behalf of ZIMMER HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER, INC., Zimmer U.S., Inc. (SCHLAFER, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jerumbo. Zimmer U.S., Inc. served on 8/21/2013, answer due 9/11/2013. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jerumbo. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jerumbo. ZIMMER HOLDINGS INC served on 8/21/2013, answer due 9/11/2013. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jerumbo. INC. ZIMMER served on 8/20/2013, answer due 9/10/2013. (BEYEA-SCHROEDER, KAREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/23/10. (jl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 18, 2013 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (jl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 18, 2013 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo added. (jl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 17, 2013 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 3:13-cv-00254. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings filed by Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Transferring case to Multidistrict Litigation in New Jersey. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (mt) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 11, 2013 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Macaluso, Tricia) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
September 11, 2013 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleadings by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Macaluso, Tricia) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Zimmer US, Inc.. (mc6) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Zimmer, Inc.. (mc6) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc.. (mc6) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Jerumbo. (Attachments: #1 Zimmer Inc. Summons, #2 Zimmer US Summons)(Davidow, Sylvia) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-5766498), filed by Mary Jerumbo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidow, Sylvia) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mc6) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]
August 14, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mc6) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerumbo v. Zimmer Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer U.S., Inc.
Represented By: STACY L. PRALL
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SCHLAFER
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Alan Ray Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: STACY L. PRALL
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SCHLAFER
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Alan Ray Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: STACY L. PRALL
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS SCHLAFER
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Alan Ray Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer GmbH
Represented By: Alan Ray Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jerumbo
Represented By: Sylvia Davidow
Represented By: G. Sean Jez
Represented By: Karen Beyea-Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?