Castruita et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Gloria Delapaz Castruita and Jose L. Castruita
Counter Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00172
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the parties meet, confer, and submit a joint report of parties planning meeting as specified in the Courts Standing Order on Pretrial deadlines no later than August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM against Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita, filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hayes, Elizabeth)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #4 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- DOT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Notary Service Request, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- ALTA Settlement Statement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Notice to Cure, #5 Proposed Order Order)(Lane, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by Jose L. Castruita, Gloria Delapaz Castruita. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- DOT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Notary Service Request, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- ALTA Settlement Statement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Notice to Cure)(Lane, Robert) Modified on 7/22/2020 (mn).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to July 21, 2020, Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Gloria Delapaz Castruita, Jose L. Castruita. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION)(Lane, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Filing by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Hayes, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1)
June 19, 2020 Notice of Correction: re #6 Pro Hac Vice Letter. The name of attorney was misspelled on the civil cover sheet. Will resubmit the pro have vice letter (jg1)
June 19, 2020 Notice of Correction: re #5 Pro Hac Vice Letter. Attorney Joshua D. Gordon is admitted to practice in the Western District of Texas. Disregard the pro hac vice ltr. (jg1)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Supplement Civil Cover Sheet by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1)
June 19, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (jg1)
June 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13677007), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castruita et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Delapaz Castruita
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Castruita
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?