Grayson et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Grayson and Bennie Grayson
Counter Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00216
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Anne T Berton
Referring Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2021 02:00 PM before Judge David C Guaderrama, Jury Trial set for 10/11/2021 09:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama, ADR Report Deadline due by 8/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2020, Discovery due by 4/7/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Parties to RETAIN local counsel no later than October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mc4) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mc4).
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bennie Grayson, Maria Luisa Grayson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before SEPTEMBER 9, 2020, why they have not complied with the Courts August 3, 2020, Order for Proposed Scheduling Order and Joint Report.Show Cause Response due to the Court by 9/9/2020. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (em)
August 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Anne T. Berton. (mt)
August 10, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. Judge Anne T. Berton no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Original Petition , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Laporte, Anthony)
August 3, 2020 Set Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2020, (mt)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT REPORT TO BE SUBMITTED BY 9/2/20 . Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (lc3)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 8/24/2020,. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (jg1)
July 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Anne T. Berton. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Laporte, Anthony)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13794108), filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laporte, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Kent M. Hanszen
Represented By: Matthew Slade Crandall Hansel
Represented By: Anthony L. Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Luisa Grayson
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Grayson
Represented By: Robert C. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?