Quesada v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: Robert C. Quesada
Defendant: Robert Erbe, J.D. Whitaker, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC), Simona Flores, Stephen Shih, Ben J.J. Bandana, Carlton Hadden, Alfredo Campos, Enrique Lopez, Victoria A. Lipnic, Office of Special Counsel (OSC), Linda Gutierrez, Mrs. and Mr. Jose Renteria, Angie Vargas, U.S. District Judge Philip R. Martinez, Orlando L. Garcia, Mrs. and Mr. Joe Lopez and Robert Joliceur
Case Number: 3:2021cv00087
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Referring Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 Certified Mailing of #8 Order (jg1)
April 27, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis (jg1)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (jg1)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert C. Quesada. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (jg1)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt of Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,, (jg1)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt of #2 Order of Recusal (jg1)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Mailing of Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (fm)
April 14, 2021 MOTION REFERRED: referred #1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referral Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (fm)
April 14, 2021 On this date came on to be considered Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.In accordance with the authority vested in the United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to LocalRule CV-72, and Appendix C, Local Rules for the Assignment of Duties to United StatesMagistrate Judges, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), the instant motion is hereby RANDOMLYREFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge in the San Antonio Division for disposition. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Mailing of #2 Order of Recusal (fm)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Frank Montalvo recused. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
April 2, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (fm)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert C. Quesada. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel)(fm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quesada v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Erbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simona Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben J.J. Bandana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Hadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria A. Lipnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Special Counsel (OSC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. and Mr. Jose Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. District Judge Philip R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando L. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. and Mr. Joe Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Joliceur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?