Hudnall et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Elias Hudnall and Robert K. Hudnall
Defendant: Kurt G. Paxson, Guy Bluff, Evanston Insurance Company, Alejandro C. Ramirez, John Does 1-100, Ty Smith, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, Garrett J. Yancey, James A. Martinez, Catherine Hanna, Hanna and Plaut LLP and Liberty Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00106
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 53 Fed Ex Receipt of #48 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #49 Order on Motion for Electronic Filing (dt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #18 Motion for Hearing Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #10 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #19 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Guy Bluff, re #35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by Defendant Guy Bluff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Raymond)
July 6, 2021 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall, re #45 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Guy Bluff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(dt)
July 1, 2021 Filing 45 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Guy Bluff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Baeza, Jonathan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 44 Certified Mail Delivery Receipt of #40 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (dt)
June 28, 2021 Filing 43 Certified Mail Delivery Receipt of #36 Order, #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (dt)
June 24, 2021 Filing 42 Certified Mailing of #36 Order, #37 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (fm)
June 24, 2021 Filing 41 Certified Mailing of #40 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (dt)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; GRANTING #20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, re #30 MOTION for Default Judgment against Alejandro Ramirez, Ty Smith and Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC MOTION to Strike #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 Answer to Complaint, #22 Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lara, Oscar)
June 23, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Guy Bluff, re #28 MOTION for Default Judgment against Guy Bluff filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Martinez, Raymond)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancy, James A. Martinez, and Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson, & Galatzans Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted [ECF No. 3] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying Motion to Remand re #17 Response filed by Sharon Elias Hudnall, Robert K. Hudnall. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Amended Response to Notice of Removal to Federal Court [ECF No. 17] is DENIED.Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
June 22, 2021 Filing 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by Guy Bluff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Raymond)
June 18, 2021 Filing 34 Defendant Guy W. Bluff's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Guy Bluff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Raymond)
June 18, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Combined Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Motion to Strike Pleadings by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey. (Robles, Ruben)
June 16, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Defendant Guy Bluff's Consent to Notice of Removal by Guy Bluff (Martinez, Raymond)
June 16, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond D. Martinez on behalf of Guy Bluff. Attorney Raymond D. Martinez added to party Guy Bluff(pty:dft) (Martinez, Raymond)
June 16, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Default Judgment against Alejandro Ramirez, Ty Smith and Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, MOTION to Strike #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 Answer to Complaint, #22 Response to Motion, by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 16, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Hearing re #28 MOTION for Default Judgment against Guy Bluff by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 16, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Default Judgment against Guy Bluff by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 15, 2021 Filing 27 First Amended ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC.(Lara, Oscar)
June 14, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' "Second Amended Response to Notice of Removal to Federal Court" by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiffs' Second Amended Response to Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Robles, Ruben)
June 11, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #22 Response to Motion, by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal, by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 10, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiffs' "Amended Response to Notice of Removal to Federal Court" by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiffs' Amended Response to Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Robles, Ruben)
June 9, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lara, Oscar)
June 7, 2021 Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey, re #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Robles, Ruben)
June 7, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Substitute Counsel)(Robles, Ruben)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Hearing by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (dt)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Amended RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal, by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (mt)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted in Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey. (Robles, Ruben)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey, re #10 MOTION for Default Judgment against Kurt Paxson and the law firm of Mounce, Green Myers, Safi, Paxson & Galatzan filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Final Judgment)(Robles, Ruben)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guy Bluff, Evanston Insurance Company, Catherine Hanna, Hanna and Plaut LLP, Liberty Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company, James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, Garrett J. Yancey amending, filed by Sharon Elias Hudnall, Robert K. Hudnall.(dt)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC, re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment against Alejandro Ramirez, Ty Smith and Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC filed by Plaintiff Sharon Elias Hudnall, Plaintiff Robert K. Hudnall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lara, Oscar)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 TY SMITH'S, ALEJANDRO C. RAMIREZ'S, AND SMITH AND RAMIREZ RESTORATOIN LLC'S JOINT ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to Complaint by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC.(Lara, Oscar)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar Arnulfo Lara on behalf of Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC. Attorney Oscar Arnulfo Lara added to party Alejandro C. Ramirez(pty:dft), Attorney Oscar Arnulfo Lara added to party Ty Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Oscar Arnulfo Lara added to party Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC(pty:dft) (Lara, Oscar)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Final Judgment against Kurt Paxson and the law firm of Mounce, Green Myers, Safi, Paxson & Galatzan by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(dt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall, re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Kurt G. Paxson (dt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(dt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey, re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Kurt G. Paxson (Robles, Ruben)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Alejandro C. Ramirez, Ty Smith, Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC (Robles, Ruben)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment against Alejandro Ramirez, Ty Smith and Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC by Robert K. Hudnall, Sharon Elias Hudnall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(dt)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal by Kurt G. Paxson re #1 Notice of Removal, (Robles, Ruben)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kurt G. Paxson. (Robles, Ruben)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson, Garrett J. Yancey To Plaintiff of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiffs Removal to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Robles, Ruben)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402 receipt number 300037751), filed by Garrett J. Yancey, James A. Martinez, Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan, Kurt G. Paxson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Deft's List of Counsel of Record, #5 Deft's Index of Matters, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(dt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2021) (dt).
May 12, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudnall et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Elias Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K. Hudnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt G. Paxson
Represented By: Ruben S. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Bluff
Represented By: Jonathan Lionel Ray Baeza
Represented By: Raymond D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro C. Ramirez
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: Oscar Arnulfo Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Smith
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: Oscar Arnulfo Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson and Galatzan
Represented By: Ruben S. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Ramirez Restoration LLC
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: Oscar Arnulfo Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett J. Yancey
Represented By: Ruben S. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Martinez
Represented By: Ruben S. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna and Plaut LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?