Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 3 Legendary Tigers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Richard A. Williams, Rene J. Cuellar, Anthony Maldonado and 3 Legendary Tigers LLC d/b/a EPTX and d/b/a EPTX Luchador
Case Number: 3:2021cv00107
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #8 Motion Substituted Service of Process. Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 3 Legendary Tigers LLC, d/b/a EPTX and d/b/a EPTX LUCHADOR, Rene J. Cuellar, Anthony Maldonado (em)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Substituted Service of Process on Defendant, Richard A. Williams by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against 3 Legendary Tigers LLC, Rene J. Cuellar, and Anthony Maldonado by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(King, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Anthony Maldonado served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (King, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. 3 Legendary Tigers LLC served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (King, Jamie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Rene J. Cuellar served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (King, Jamie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3 Legendary Tigers LLC, Rene J. Cuellar, Anthony Maldonado, Richard A. Williams. (em)
May 13, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (em)
May 13, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (em)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14802905), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 3 Legendary Tigers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene J. Cuellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Legendary Tigers LLC d/b/a EPTX and d/b/a EPTX Luchador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?